Concovich v. Air Evac EMS Inc
Plaintiff: Joan Concovich
Defendant: Air Evac EMS Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv00294
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Williamson
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Presiding Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum and order, the Court GRANTS Air Evac's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 14 ) as to Concovich's Illinois Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Trade Practices Act claim. The CLERK is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Air Evac and against Concovich. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 3/4/2016. (wtw)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Parties will note changes to paragraphs 8 and 15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 8/18/15. (sgp)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's request for expedited, limited discovery (Doc. 33 ). See attached for details. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 6/26/2015. (jls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concovich v. Air Evac EMS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Concovich
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Evac EMS Inc
Represented By: Kyle P Seelbach
Represented By: Christopher J. Valeriote
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?