Diaz-Guillen v. Vieregge et al

Plaintiff: Luis M Diaz-Guillen
Defendant: J D Vieregge, Brent Ellis, Aaron L Lay, Matt McConkey, Vipin Shaw and Jay L Swanson
Case Number: 3:2015cv01101
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 88 ORDER ADOPTING 87 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING 66 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Jay L. Swanson. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/19/2018. (mlp)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 80 ORDER regarding 66 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jay L Swanson. The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is hereby CONVERTED to a Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies. Plaintiff is GRANT ED through February 22, 2018 to file any additional materials regarding grievances he made against Dr. Shah that were not already included in his Response (Doc. 75) or Declaration in Opposition (Doc. 76). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment is SET for hearing on February 26, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in the East Saint Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Plaintiff shall appear by videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 2/9/2018. (jkb2)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 69 ORDER GRANTING 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Vieregge, McConkey, and Lay. These Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Further, in light of this ruling, Defendants Vieregge, McConkey, and Lay's Motion to Stay Discovery and Deadlines (Doc. 56) is MOOT. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/20/2017. (mlp)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER re 19 Waiver of Service Executed, 20 Waiver of Service Executed, 31 Summons Returned Executed: Responsive pleading deadline extended to November 14, 2016. Clerk to mail Order as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 10/24/16. (sgp)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 12 Motion to State a Condition Claim under the Fourteenth Amendment (construed as a Motion to Amend). The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint as the First Amended Complaint. Also, the Clerk of Court shall prepare for Defendants J.D. Vieregge, Matt McConkey, and Aaron Lay: (1) Form 5 (Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons), and (2)Form 6 (Waiver of Service of Summons). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 5/24/2016. (nms)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/16/2016. (tjk)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order 4 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should Plaintiff wish to proceed with this case, Plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint within 35 days of the entry of this order. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2015). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/16/2015. (tjk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz-Guillen v. Vieregge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis M Diaz-Guillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Vieregge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron L Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt McConkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vipin Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay L Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?