Shadle v. USA

Petitioner: Jason L. Shadle
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2016cv00203
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER dismissing 37 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/9/2018. (jdh)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 31 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/30/2017. (jdh)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denying 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Jason L. Shadle. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/15/2017. (jdh)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2016 09:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. The Court further finds that he is unable to afford counsel and accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that, pursuant to Rule 8(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings and 18 U.S.C. § 3006A, a CJA attorney is APPOINTED to represent Shadle for the purposes of this hearing only. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the Public Defen der's Officer for theSouthern District of Illinois and to add a CJA attorney, once identified, as an attorney of record for Petitioner Shadle in this matter and the underlying criminal case and to further allow the CJA attorney access to sealed documents in that case. Petitioner to appear via video conferencing. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/16/2016. (jdh)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ORDERS the Government to file a response to Shadle's petition (Doc. 1) by May 2, 2016. The Government shall, as part of its response, attach all relevant portions of the record. Petitioner may file a reply brief (no longer than 5 pages) by May 23rd, 2016. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/30/2016. (jdh)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court ORDERS the Petitioner to file a supplement to his petition (Doc. 1) by March 30th, 2016. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/1/2016. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shadle v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason L. Shadle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: George A. Norwood(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?