Meyer v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Meyer
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections, Robinson Correctional Center and Shane Pica
Case Number: 3:2017cv00259
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Reagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. This dismissal shall count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 11/6/2017. (tjk)
November 6, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STRICKEN - ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. This dismissal shall count as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 11/6/2017. (tjk) Modified on 11/7/2017 (cjo).
July 17, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Dismissing complaint without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff granted leave to file a "First Amended Complaint" on or before August 14, 2017. 4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense denied as moot. 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan on 7/17/2017. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Illinois Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Pica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?