Allen v. Bond County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Robert Allen
Defendant: Bond County Jail, Jeff Brown and Bond County, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2017cv00351
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/22/2017. (jaj)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Allen. Failure to pay the full filing fee within twenty-one (21) days (on or before June 8, 2017) shall result in dismissal of this case and the action with prejudi ce for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within twenty-one (21) days (on or before June 8, 2017) why this Court should not sanction him for fraudulent litigation conduct by dismissing his Complaint and the action with prejudice, based on the omission of his entire litigation history from the Complaint (Doc. 1) and IFP Motion (Doc. 5). If this Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to show cause why he should not be s anctioned, an order shall be entered dismissing the Complaint and action with prejudice, and this case shall be closed. Failure to comply with both of the Orders herein by the deadline imposed shall result in dismissal of the Complaint and this action with prejudice for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. (Action due by 6/8/2017, Show Cause Response due by 6/8/2017). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/17/2017. (tjk)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to provide the Court with a filing fee of $400.00 or a properly completed IFP Motion on or before May 30, 2017. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this action for want of prosecution and/or for failure to comply with a court order under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Action due by 5/30/2017). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/8/2017. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Bond County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bond County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?