Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thomas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2017cv00428
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Presiding Judge: Clifford J. Proud
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 10/23/2018. (jmt)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. The Commissioner's final decision denying plaintiff's application for social security disability benefits is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for rehearing and reconsideration of the evidence, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff.Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifford J. Proud on 6/26/2018. (jmt)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting 7 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kenneth Thomas. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/30/2017. (jdh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thomas
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?