Brown v. USA

Petitioner: Erik Scott Brown
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2017cv00430
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Tazewell
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Erik Scott Brown. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/8/2018. (jdh)
January 3, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/7/2018 01:30 PM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. The Court ORDERS pursuant to Rule 8(c) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings and 18 U.S.C. § 3006A, attorney John D . Stobbs is APPOINTED to represent Brown for the purposes of this hearing only. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to add Stobbs as an attorney of record for Brown in the underlying criminal case and allow Stobbs access to sealed documents in that case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/3/2018. (jdh)
July 26, 2017 2 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court ORDERS the Government to file a response to the petitioner's § 2255 motion within THIRTY DAYS of the date this order is entered. The Government shall, as part of its response, attach all relevant portions of the record in the underlying criminal case. The Petitioner shall have FOURTEEN DAYS to reply to the Government's response. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/26/2017. (jdh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erik Scott Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: George A. Norwood(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?