Mitchell v. Murray Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jetson Mitchell
Defendant: Murray Energy Corporation, American Coal Company, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2017cv00444
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Reona J. Daly
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING 63 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/20/2019. (jmp2)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 41 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Jetson Mitchell. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file his proposed first amended class action complaint as the First Amended Complaint by October 17, 2018. The parties are ORDERED to submit an amended joint report and proposed scheduling and discovery order for the Court's consideration by October 22, 2018 to RJDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/15/2018. (nmf)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendations and DENYING 26 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/9/2018. (klh2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Murray Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetson Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin P. Green
Represented By: Thomas J. Lech
Represented By: Thomas P. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Coal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?