Morris v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Barry Morris
Defendant: John Baldwin, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Frank Lawrence, H. Hawkins, Gail Walls, Bobby Hughes and Cindy Meyer
Case Number: 3:2017cv00456
Filed: May 2, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Reona J. Daly
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 36 Motion for Default Judgment; finding as moot 40 Motion ; adopting 61 Report and Recommendations, vacating the Clerk's entry of default 35 and allowing defendants to file their answer instanter. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 8/30/2018. (klh)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting in part 1 Motion for TRO/Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 5/11/17. (klh)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. In the Complaint (Doc. 5), Plaintiff requests injunctive relief pursuant to Rule 65(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. A Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Injunction (Doc. 1) was therefore included as a separate docket entry in CM/ECF, along with a copy of the Complaint. This Motion (Doc. 1) shall be REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge for prompt disposition. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 5/5/2017. (jaj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?