Hart v. Jefferson County Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: Joshua James Hart
Defendant: Jefferson County Justice Center and James Mount
Case Number: 3:2017cv00602
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/14/2019. (jdh)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, denied as moot 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joshua James Hart. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/17/2018. (jdh)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 2 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel filed by Joshua James Hart AND 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joshua James Hart. Motions Taken Under Advisement: 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Action due by 9/29/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 9/1/2017. (sgp)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/24/2017. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Jefferson County Justice Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua James Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?