Coleman et al v. United States Marshal Service et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Coleman, Randall A. Miller, Quincy O. Edwards, Joseph K. Rander, Jamar Jones and Andrew Dunk
Defendant: United States Marshal Service and Randy Cobb
Case Number: 3:2017cv01282
Filed: November 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice for failure to comply with an order of this Court. Further, because the Complaint failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, this dismissal shall count as one of Plaintiff's three allotted strikes within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/9/2018. (tjk)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following plaintiffs are TERMINATED as parties in this action: ANDREW DUNK and RANDALL A. MILLER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to open a new case for both of these plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint (Doc. 1), which includes Counts 1 through 3, is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted in this case and in each newly-severed case. Each plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a First Amended Complaint in the case opened in his name on or before April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/26/2018. (tjk)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 IT IS ORDERED that MILLER has until February 15, 2018 to submit: (1) an affirmative statement indicating that he wishes to proceed with this group action and (2) a signed copy of the Complaint. If MILLER fails to respond to this Order, he will be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or failure to comply with a Court Order. To enable MILLER to comply with this Order, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to re-send a copy of the Complaint to him. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DUNK has until Fe bruary 15, 2018 to submit: (1) an affirmative statement indicating that he wishes to proceed with this group action; (2) an IFP Motion; and (3) a signed copy of the Complaint. If DUNK fails to respond to this Order, he will be dismissed for want of prosecution and/or failure to comply with a Court Order. To enable the DUNK to comply with this Order, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to re-send a copy of the Complaint to him. (Action due by 2/15/2018) Joseph K. Rander, Quincy O. Edwards and Jamar Jones terminated. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/1/2018. (tjk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. United States Marshal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy O. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph K. Rander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?