Eastman v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey H. Eastman
Defendant: John Doe and Warden of Big Muddy River Correctional Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00543
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Christian
Presiding Judge: David R. Herndon
Referring Judge: Donald G. Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Warden of Big Muddy River Correctional Center and Memorandum of Law filed by Warden of Big Muddy River Correctional Center. The Court GRANTS 22 Motion to Dismiss and ADOPTS 23 Report and Recommendations in its entirety. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 5/24/2018. (lmp)
March 22, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that COUNTS 3, 4, and 5, which are unrelated to the other claims in this action, are SEVERED into a new case against SANTOS, MUELLER, KINK, STOCK, KREBS, DOWNES, JOHNSON, MCABEE, WALKER, ZELASKO, WEGMAN, LAHR, WEXFORD, and IDOC. (Action due by 4/26/2018). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 3/22/2018. (tjk)
March 16, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. 3), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the i nmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS T HEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 9/1/2 017 to 3/7/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Jacksonville Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 4/30/2018). Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 3/16/2018. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey H. Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Big Muddy River Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?