Doe et al v. East St. Louis Housing Authority et al

Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Illinois State Rifle Association and N. Doe
Defendant: Mildred Motley and East St. Louis Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2018cv00545
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: St. Clair
0 Judge: J Phil Gilbert
1 Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Compaint. Responsive pleadings due no later than September 22, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/10/2018. (jmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 8, 2018 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Compaint by All Defendants. (Moore, Stephen)
August 25, 2018 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by N. Doe, Illinois State Rifle Association, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc..(Sigale, David)
August 13, 2018 24 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of the Parties)(amv)
August 10, 2018 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/10/2018. David Sigale for Plaintiffs. Stephen Moore for Defendants. Court modifies proposed scheduling order to comport with presumptive trial date. Court discusses discovery disputes and the narrowing of issues for dispositive motion briefing. The 8/16/18 telephone conference is CANCELED. (Court Reporter n/a.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 12, 2018 22 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 8/10/2018 at 3:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Joint Report of the Parties due 8/3/18. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 11, 2018 21 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION of Hearing: Scheduling conference for 7/18/2018 is cancelled and reset by separate notice. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
July 11, 2018 20 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Call-in information remains the same. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2018 19 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 7/18/2018 at 4:00 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
June 22, 2018 18 CJRA TRACK B assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Jury Trial is set for 6/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
June 21, 2018 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by East St. Louis Housing Authority, Mildred Motley.(Moore, Stephen)
May 21, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than June 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 5/21/2018. (rms2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 18, 2018 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by East St. Louis Housing Authority, Mildred Motley. (Moore, Stephen)
April 19, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than May 18, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 4/19/2018. (rms2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 18, 2018 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by East St. Louis Housing Authority, Mildred Motley. (Moore, Stephen)
April 1, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Mildred Motley served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (Sigale, David)
April 1, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. East St. Louis Housing Authority served on 3/29/2018, answer due 4/19/2018. (Sigale, David)
March 8, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Sigale on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sigale, David)
March 8, 2018 9 Summons Issued as to East St. Louis Housing Authority and Mildred Motley and forwarded to Attorney David Sigale for service. (jsm2)
March 8, 2018 8 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., N. Doe, Illinois State Rifle Association. In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Sigale does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 8, 2018 7 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-545-JPG-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (jsm2)
March 7, 2018 6 Summons Requested. (Sigale, David)
March 7, 2018 5 Summons Requested. (Sigale, David)
March 7, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Illinois State Rifle Association. (Sigale, David)
March 7, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Sigale, David)
March 7, 2018 2 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint (Civil Cover Sheet) (Sigale, David)
March 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3500147.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Sigale, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. East St. Louis Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois State Rifle Association
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. Doe
Represented By: David G. Sigale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Motley
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East St. Louis Housing Authority
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?