Hallows v. Madison County Jail et al

Plaintiff: John Hallows
Defendant: Hare and Barrett
Case Number: 3:2018cv00881
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: Illinois Southern District Court
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: J. Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Williams
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Barrett, Court, Hare, Madison County Jail, Unknown Party, Wilson, John Lakin, Randy Young against John Hallows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/27/2018. (amv)
May 8, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/8/2018. (tjk)
April 17, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. 2), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the i nmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS T HEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 10/1/ 2017 to 4/11/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 105 1 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at the Madison County Jail. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 6/1/2018). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/17/2018. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallows v. Madison County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hallows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?