Spears et al v. Marion County Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Sherri Spears and Kim McBride-Davies
Defendant: Brenda Lingafelter, Richard Gregg, Gertie Walker, Georgia Miller, Patrick Stetelin, Marion County Housing Authority, Nancy Lackey and Gary Purcell
Case Number: 3:2018cv01325
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Michael J Reagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Nancy Lackey, Brenda Lingafelter, Richard Gregg, Gertie Walker, Georgia Miller, Marion County Housing Authority, Patrick Stetelin, Gary Purcell. Defendants are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 9/10/2018, to file an answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/13/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/13/2018. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 10:45 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call 888-273-3658. The access code is 1770924. The security code is 1325. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm)
August 10, 2018 Filing 11 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. Jury Trial set for 10/21/2019 at 9:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(rah)
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Defendants. (Dinsmore, Mark)
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dinsmore, Mark)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Ohl on behalf of All Defendants (Ohl, Donald)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark William Dinsmore, II on behalf of All Defendants (Dinsmore, Mark)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Richard Gregg served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Nancy Lackey served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Brenda Lingafelter served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Marion County Housing Authority served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Georgia Miller served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Gary Purcell served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Patrick Stetelin served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; Gertie Walker served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Roosevelt, Greg)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Richard Gregg, Nancy Lackey, Brenda Lingafelter, Marion County Housing Authority, Georgia Miller, Gary Purcell, Patrick Stetelin, Gertie Walker and forwarded to Attorney Roosevelt for service. (jsm2)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Michael J. Reagan and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-1325-MJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (jsm2)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg E. Roosevelt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roosevelt, Greg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested. (Roosevelt, Greg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3599974.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roosevelt, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears et al v. Marion County Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Lingafelter
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gregg
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gertie Walker
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Miller
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Stetelin
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Housing Authority
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Lackey
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Purcell
Represented By: Mark William Dinsmore, II
Represented By: Donald J. Ohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Spears
Represented By: Greg E. Roosevelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim McBride-Davies
Represented By: Greg E. Roosevelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?