Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. Turman et al
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Connie Sout, Jacob D. Cronin, The Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, Lynn E. Meyer, James Moore, Jacob D. Gettings, 4850 Longhorn, LLC, Sinclair Family Farm, LLC, Land Trust Agreement No., Cathy Schrodt a/k/a Cathy Perkinson, Family Trust created by the Revocable Trust Agreement of Herbert Stanley Fraley, Sheila Segraves, Quicken Loans, Inc., Jacob Gettings, Jr., Delbert Fraley, Gerald Scott Turman, Farm Credit Services of Illinois, FLCA, Merl A. Albert, Kaeta E. Cronin, Maurita Fraley, Danny Malone, Maurita Fraley Revocable Trust Agreement, Jack Moore, First Collinsville Bank, RWF Family Limited Partnership, Ltd., Greg Stout, Frank Moore, Janet K. Meyer, Mildred Louise Gettings, Lawrence N. Albert, U.S. Bank National Association, Carrolton Bank, Doris Malone, Federal Agricultural Mortgage Corporation, Barbara A. Rogers, NAF, Inc. f/k/a New America Financial Incorporated, 2.97 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, Connie Stout, 16.99 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, 1.89 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, Unknown Owners, 12.52 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, Cathy Schrodt, 11.12 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, NAF, Inc., 0.03 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, 3.47 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, 13.80 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, The Principia Corporation, 3.65 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, 4.38 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, Federal Bank of St. Louis, 6.42 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, 3.25 Acres more or less of Real Property in Jersey County, Illinois, 7.05 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois, 7.03 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois and 5.25 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2018cv01502
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
County: Jersey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #91 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Filer and s/ signature do not match. Normally this document would be stricken and filer asked to refile using their own login and password, but motion #90 has been ruled on so this Notice is sent for informational purposes only for future filings. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 11, 2018 Filing 93 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by First Collinsville Bank.(Stine, Kevin)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying #90 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Although Plaintiff filed an amended complaint, the allegations have not changed such that additional time to respond is warranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/11/2018. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 10, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #89 Amended Complaint,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rolf, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 90 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #89 Amended Complaint,,, by Jacob D. Cronin, Kaeta E. Cronin, Delbert Fraley, Maurita Fraley, Janet K. Meyer, Lynn E. Meyer, RWF Family Limited Partnership, Ltd., Barbara A. Rogers, Cathy Schrodt. (Walker, Jordan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Verified Amended Complaint for Condemnation of Pipeline Easements against All Defendants, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, part 3, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 2B, #6 Exhibit 3A, #7 Exhibit 3B, #8 Exhibit 4A, #9 Exhibit 4B, #10 Exhibit 5A, #11 Exhibit 5B, #12 Exhibit 6A, #13 Exhibit 6B, #14 Exhibit 7A, #15 Exhibit 7B, #16 Exhibit 8A, #17 Exhibit 8B, #18 Exhibit 9A, #19 Exhibit 9B, #20 Exhibit 10A, #21 Exhibit 10B, #22 Exhibit 11A, #23 Exhibit 11B, #24 Exhibit 12A, #25 Exhibit 12B, #26 Exhibit 13A, #27 Exhibit 13B, #28 Exhibit 14A, #29 Exhibit 14B, #30 Exhibit 15A, #31 Exhibit 15B, #32 Exhibit 16A, #33 Exhibit 16B)(Petrilli, Lisa)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 71.1(i)(1)(A) and the Notice of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff (Doc. #82 ), Defendants James Moore, Jack Moore, Frank Moore, and the 7.03 Acres more or less of real property located in Jersey County referred to as Tract IL-JC-156.000 are DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to TERMINATE these Defendants as parties to this action. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/9/2018. (mlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 9, 2018 Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion re #85 First MOTION to Strike #83 MOTION TO CONFIRM CONDEMNATION AUTHORITY filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
October 8, 2018 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support re #85 First MOTION to Strike #83 MOTION TO CONFIRM CONDEMNATION AUTHORITY filed by Jacob D. Cronin, Kaeta E. Cronin, Delbert Fraley, Maurita Fraley, Janet K. Meyer, Lynn E. Meyer, RWF Family Limited Partnership, Ltd., Barbara A. Rogers, Cathy Schrodt. (Walker, Jordan)
October 8, 2018 Filing 85 First MOTION to Strike #83 MOTION TO CONFIRM CONDEMNATION AUTHORITY by Jacob D. Cronin, Kaeta E. Cronin, Delbert Fraley, Maurita Fraley, Janet K. Meyer, Lynn E. Meyer, Barbara A. Rogers, Cathy Schrodt. (Walker, Jordan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Support re #83 MOTION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Russell English)(Petrilli, Lisa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION by All Plaintiffs. (Petrilli, Lisa)
October 5, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Petrilli, Lisa)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Answer due by 11/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/5/2018. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 4, 2018 Filing 80 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 Amended Complaint, by The Principia Corporation. (Barron, Lee)
September 25, 2018 Filing 79 SERVICE by Publication filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Last publication date 9/5/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #77 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Improperly Joined Party. Pursuant to Rule 71.1(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court may at any time dismiss a defendant who was unnecessarily or improperly joined. Plaintiff avers that the Federal Bank of St. Louis, now known as the Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, was improperly joined as an interested party in Count I of the Complaint for Condemnation. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion and DISMISSES the Federal Bank of St. Louis, now known as the Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/25/2018. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 24, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily Dismiss Improperly Joined Party Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 71.1(i) by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Responses due by 10/29/2018 (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 24, 2018 Filing 76 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 9/13/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 24, 2018 Filing 75 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 9/13/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 24, 2018 Filing 74 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 9/13/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 73 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 9/6/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 72 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 9/6/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 71 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 09/6/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 70 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 9/6/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 14, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Stine on behalf of First Collinsville Bank (Stine, Kevin)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher P. Kellett on behalf of 4850 Longhorn, LLC, Jacob D. Gettings, Mildred Louise Gettings, Jacob Gettings, Jr., Danny Malone, Doris Malone, Sheila Segraves, Sinclair Family Farm, LLC, Connie Stout, Greg Stout, Gerald Scott Turman. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/13/2018. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 12, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher P. Kellett $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3670059 by on behalf of 4850 Longhorn, LLC, Jacob D. Gettings, Mildred Louise Gettings, Jacob Gettings, Jr., Danny Malone, Doris Malone, Sheila Segraves, Sinclair Family Farm, LLC, Connie Stout, Greg Stout, Gerald Scott Turman. (Kellett, Christopher)
September 11, 2018 Filing 66 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 8/28/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 65 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 8/28/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Carrolton Bank served on 8/25/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by Spire STL Pipeline LLC on 8/25/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #55 Notice of Appearance filed by Maurita Fraley. Document is filed as duplicative of the Notice of Appearance filed at document #54 .(kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due October 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/10/2018. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 7, 2018 Filing 61 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Jacob D. Cronin, Kaeta E. Cronin, Delbert Fraley, Maurita Fraley, Janet K. Meyer, Lynn E. Meyer, RWF Family Limited Partnership, Ltd., Barbara A. Rogers, Cathy Schrodt. (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Kaeta E. Cronin (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Jacob D. Cronin (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Cathy Schrodt (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Barbara A. Rogers (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of RWF Family Limited Partnership, Ltd. (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 55 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Maurita Fraley (Walker, Jordan) Modified on 9/10/2018 (kdb).
September 7, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Delbert Fraley (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Lynn E. Meyer (Walker, Jordan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan H. Walker on behalf of Janet K. Meyer (Walker, Jordan)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due October 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 9/6/2018. (anj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 6, 2018 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4850 Longhorn, LLC, Sinclair Family Farm, LLC. (Schaeffer, Tyler)
September 6, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4850 Longhorn, LLC, Jacob D. Gettings, Mildred Louise Gettings, Jacob Gettings, Jr., Danny Malone, Doris Malone, Sheila Segraves, Sinclair Family Farm, LLC, Connie Stout, Greg Stout, Gerald Scott Turman. (Schaeffer, Tyler)
September 6, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Charles Schaeffer on behalf of 4850 Longhorn, LLC, Jacob D. Gettings, Mildred Louise Gettings, Jacob Gettings, Jr., Danny Malone, Doris Malone, Sheila Segraves, Sinclair Family Farm, LLC, Connie Stout, Greg Stout, Gerald Scott Turman (Schaeffer, Tyler)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REINSTATING #44 Amended Complaint. The Court hereby waives Local Rule 15.1 and will allow the amendment to stand as currently filed. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a consolidated amended complaint once all Defendants are served and their time to answer has passed. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/23/2018. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER STRIKING #44 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). However, the amended pleading only contains a new count as opposed to the whole Amended Complaint, and the Court will not accept piecemeal amendments. Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to file its full Amended Complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this Court's Local Rules. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/22/2018. (mlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 22, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 22, 2018 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Condemnation adding Count XV against All Defendants, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16A, #2 Exhibit 16B)(Petrilli, Lisa) Modified on 8/23/2018 (lmb). Reinstated on 8/23/2018 per Order at Doc. 47 (drb).
August 17, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC Certification for Service by Publication (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Unknown owners) (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Rolf on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/16/2018. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 16, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A. Rolf $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3646772 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rolf, David)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa A. Petrilli on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/16/2018. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 16, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Petrilli on behalf of Spire STL Pipeline LLC (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk W. Laudeman on behalf of Spire STL Pipeline LLC (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 36 EXHIBIT by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Exhibit to #1 Complaint,,, Civil Cover Sheet. (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 35 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-1502-NJR-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (lmb)
August 16, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencment of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Laudeman, Kirk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lisa A. Petrilli $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3645507 by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Rolf on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rolf, David)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3645003.), filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4B, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5A, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5B, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6A, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 6B, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 7A, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 7B, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 8A, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 8B, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 9A, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 9B, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 10A, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 10B, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 11A, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 11B, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 12A, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 12B, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 13A, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 13B, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 14A, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 14B, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 15A, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 15B)(Laudeman, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. Turman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Sout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob D. Cronin
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Reserve Bank of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn E. Meyer
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob D. Gettings
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4850 Longhorn, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Family Farm, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Trust Agreement No.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Schrodt a/k/a Cathy Perkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Trust created by the Revocable Trust Agreement of Herbert Stanley Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Segraves
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Gettings, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delbert Fraley
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Scott Turman
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Services of Illinois, FLCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merl A. Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaeta E. Cronin
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurita Fraley
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Malone
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurita Fraley Revocable Trust Agreement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Collinsville Bank
Represented By: Kevin J. Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWF Family Limited Partnership, Ltd.
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Stout
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet K. Meyer
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Louise Gettings
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence N. Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrolton Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Malone
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Agricultural Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Rogers
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAF, Inc. f/k/a New America Financial Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.97 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Stout
Represented By: Christopher P. Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16.99 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.89 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12.52 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Schrodt
Represented By: Jordan H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11.12 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAF, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.03 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.47 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13.80 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Principia Corporation
Represented By: Lee W. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.65 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.38 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bank of St. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6.42 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.25 Acres more or less of Real Property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.05 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.03 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.25 acres more or less of real property in Jersey County, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Kirk W. Laudeman
Represented By: Lisa A. Petrilli
Represented By: David A. Rolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?