Hopfinger v. City of Nashville, Illinois
Plaintiff: Melissa Hopfinger
Defendant: City of Nashville, Illinois
Case Number: 3:2018cv01523
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Melissa Hopfinger. (Wolf, Ferne)
September 28, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by City of Nashville, Illinois.(Heise, Douglas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Nashville, Illinois. (Heise, Douglas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Nashville, Illinois. Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Heise, Douglas)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas R. Heise on behalf of City of Nashville, Illinois (Heise, Douglas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Hopfinger. City of Nashville, Illinois served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Wolf, Ferne)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa Hopfinger. The document incorrectly reflects the plaintiff's name in the caption. Future filings should indicate the proper plaintiff. This notice is sent for informational purposes only.(kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Nashville, Illinois, and returned to Attorney Wolf for service. (kls3)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:18-cv-1523-NJR-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill A. Silverstein on behalf of Melissa Hopfinger (Silverstein, Jill)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Pierson on behalf of Melissa Hopfinger (Pierson, Joshua)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ferne P. Wolf on behalf of Melissa Hopfinger (Wolf, Ferne)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Nashville, Illinois ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3650577.), filed by Melissa Hopfinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Melissa Hopfinger Termination Letter), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Page C-12 from City of Nashville, IL Handbook), #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons City of Nashville, IL Summons)(Wolf, Ferne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopfinger v. City of Nashville, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hopfinger
Represented By: Jill A. Silverstein
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Nashville, Illinois
Represented By: Douglas R. Heise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?