USA v. $510,910.00 in United States Currency, et al
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: $510,910.00 in United States currency, One Ford Forest River Forester Recreational Vehicle and One Ruger LCP .380 Handgun, SN 371699695
Claimant: Patrick N. Barber and Stephen M Komie
Case Number: 3:2018cv01683
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Stephen C Williams
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 24 Warrant Issued With Respect to One Ruger LCP.380 Handgun, SN: 371699695 (kek)
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 Warrant Issued With Respect to One Ford Forest River Forester Recreational Vehicle. (kek)
November 2, 2018 Filing 22 Warrant Issued With Respect to $510,910.00 in United States Currency. (kek)
October 31, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE by USA (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Coonan, William)
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 11/16/2018 at 3:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #17 CJRA Track Order. The docket text incorrectly stated this matter is set for a jury trial. This matter is set for a bench trial as correctly stated in the order. Docket text has been amended to reflect bench trial. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams: Scheduling and Discovery Hearing held on 10/19/2018. Liam Coonan for the United States. Stephen Komie for the Claimants. The Court adopts the proposed scheduling order with agreed changes to paragraphs 10, 12, and 13. (Court Reporter n/a.) (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 CJRA TRACK C assigned: The Court GRANTS #14 Joint Motion for Reclassification of Case Track. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for 1/22/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The Presumptive Bench Trial month is RESET for February, 2020. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb) Modified on 10/22/2018 (drb).
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $510,910.00 in United States Currency, One Ford Forest River Forester Recreational Vehicle, One Ruger LCP.380 Handgun, SN 371699695, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration)(Coonan, William)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ACTION re #14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Stephen M Komie, Patrick N. Barber. Attorney Komie has incorporated within this Motion a proposed document/order. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via email to the Court (see CM/ECF User's Manual at pgs. 2.6-2/7). Proposed documents need to be emailed to the proper judge. (kls3)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Reclassification of Case Track by Patrick N. Barber, Stephen M Komie. (Komie, Stephen)
October 11, 2018 Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2018, per Order at Doc. 13. (kls3)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File. Amended complaint to be filed by October 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams on 10/10/2018. (jmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #11 Motion for Leave to File filed by USA. Proposed amended complaint was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via email to the Court (see CM/ECF User's Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed amended complaint to be deleted in accordance with this Court's practices. Proposed documents need to be emailed to the proper judge. (kls3)
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by USA. (Attachments: deleted per NOM at doc. 12 # 1 Amended Complaint, #2 Amended Declaration)(Coonan, William) Modified on 10/10/2018 (dkd).
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 3:30 PM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. (amv)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 CJRA TRACK A assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Bench Trial month set for June, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen M Komie, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick N. Barber. Docs. 4 and 6 are fillable documents, which allow changes to be made to the document. Fillable documents should be saved and converted to non-fillable pdf documents before filing in CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only; no further action is required by the filer. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 CLAIM Verified by Stephen M Komie. (Komie, Stephen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Komie on behalf of Stephen M Komie (Komie, Stephen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified by Patrick N. Barber. (Komie, Stephen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Komie on behalf of Patrick N. Barber (Komie, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:18-cv-1683-NJR-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Coonan on behalf of United States (Coonan, William)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $510,910.00 in United States currency, One Ford Forest River Forester Recreational Vehicle, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coonan, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $510,910.00 in United States Currency, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: William E. Coonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: William E. Coonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $510,910.00 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Ford Forest River Forester Recreational Vehicle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Ruger LCP .380 Handgun, SN 371699695
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Patrick N. Barber
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen M Komie
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?