Sullivan v. American Commercial Barge Line LLC et al
Plaintiff: James D Sullivan
Defendant: ACBL River Operations LLC, C/C Transport, Inc., Commercial Barge Line Company, American Commercial Barge Line LLC and American Commercial Barge Line Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01815
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C/C Transport, Inc.. (Schag, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against ACBL River Operations LLC, American Commercial Barge Line Company, American Commercial Barge Line LLC, Commercial Barge Line Company by C/C Transport, Inc..(Schag, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of C/C Transport, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of C/C Transport, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by C/C Transport, Inc. Defendant C/C Transport, Inc. is GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 11/30/2018, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 11/13/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 12, 2018 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by C/C Transport, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Broom, III on behalf of James D Sullivan (Broom, William)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by C/C Transport, Inc. Defendant C/C Transport, Inc. is GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 11/13/2018, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 10/30/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 29, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by C/C Transport, Inc.. (Flatt, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Flatt on behalf of C/C Transport, Inc. (Flatt, Gregory)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Schag on behalf of C/C Transport, Inc. (Schag, Michael)
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James D Sullivan. C/C Transport, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Goldsmith, Frederick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James D Sullivan. Commercial Barge Line Company served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Goldsmith, Frederick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James D Sullivan. ACBL River Operations LLC served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Goldsmith, Frederick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James D Sullivan. American Commercial Barge Line Company served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Goldsmith, Frederick)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. American Commercial Barge Line LLC served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Goldsmith, Frederick)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ACBL River Operations LLC, American Commercial Barge Line Company, American Commercial Barge Line LLC, C/C Transport, Inc., Commercial Barge Line Company. (jsm2)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #4 Summons Issued. Clerk issued Summons with incorrect dates and will reissue with correct date. See attached document for specifics (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 STRICKEN - Summons Issued as to ACBL River Operations LLC, American Commercial Barge Line Company, American Commercial Barge Line LLC, C/C Transport, Inc., and Commercial Barge Line Company. (jsm2) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jsm2).
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-cv-1815-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (jsm2)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James D Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ACBL LLC, #3 Summons ACBL River Ops, #4 Summons ACBL Co., #5 Summons CBLC, #6 Summons C/C Transport)(Goldsmith, Frederick)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Baer Goldsmith on behalf of James D Sullivan (Goldsmith, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. American Commercial Barge Line LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACBL River Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/C Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Schag
Represented By: Gregory C Flatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Barge Line Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commercial Barge Line LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commercial Barge Line Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D Sullivan
Represented By: Frederick Baer Goldsmith
Represented By: William L. Broom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?