City of Columbia, Illinois v. Crown Castle GT Company LLC, et al

Plaintiff: City of Columbia, Illinois
Defendant: Crown Castle International Corp., GTE Wireless Inc., Crown Castle GT Company LLC and Verizon Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02063
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Reona J Daly
1 Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 Joint MOTION to Stay and Combined Brief in Support filed by City of Columbia, Illinois. The case is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Remand. No schedule has been entered at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 12/21/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 19, 2018 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Stay and Combined Brief in Support by City of Columbia, Illinois. (Streubel, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Columbia, Illinois. Responses due by 1/14/2019 (Eveker, Margaret)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #20 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by City of Columbia, Illinois. Login used and signature do not match. Filer to re-file document. (kls3)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 ENTRY STRICKEN. MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Columbia, Illinois. Responses due by 1/14/2019 (Eveker, Margaret) Modified on 12/11/2018 (kls3).
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Castle International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Tower 2 Lease, #2 Exhibit B-Tower 2 Lease Amd, #3 Exhibit C-Default Notice, #4 Exhibit D-Default Response, #5 Exhibit E-Vogel Response, #6 Exhibit F-Response LEtter, #7 Exhibit G-Letter to Vogel, #8 Exhibit H-Letter to Ebken)(Wacker, Brian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Castle GT Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Tower 2 Lease, #2 Exhibit B-Tower 2 Lease Amd, #3 Exhibit C-Default Notice, #4 Exhibit D-Default Response, #5 Exhibit E-Vogel Response, #6 Exhibit F-Response LEtter, #7 Exhibit G-Letter to Vogel, #8 Exhibit H-Letter to Ebken)(Wacker, Brian)
November 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by City of Columbia, Illinois Filing Memorandum re Service on Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Compliance for Service on Secretary of State)(Streubel, David)
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 Summons Returned Executed filed by City of Columbia, Illinois. Document should not be filed in our Court. (kls3)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY STRICKEN. SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Columbia, Illinois. (Streubel, David) Modified on 11/21/2018 (kls3).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Margaret C. Eveker on behalf of City of Columbia, Illinois. (kls3)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Margaret C. Eveker $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3726850 by on behalf of City of Columbia, Illinois. (Eveker, Margaret)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Streubel on behalf of City of Columbia, Illinois (Streubel, David)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Crown Castle International Corp., Crown Castle GT Company LLC. A proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via email to the Court (see CM/ECF User's Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7. The proposed order is to be deleted in accordance with this Court's practices. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kls3)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint filed by Crown Castle International Corp. and Crown Castle GT Company LLC. Defendants Crown Castle GT Company LLC and Crown Castle International Corp. are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 11/30/2018, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 11/15/2018. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp.. ( Deleted per NOM at doc. 11. Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proposed Order for Consent Motion for Extension of Time)(Wacker, Brian) Modified on 11/15/2018 (dkd).
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Wacker on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. (Wacker, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Andrew Welply on behalf of Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. (Welply, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/13/2018. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:18-cv-2063-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crown Castle GT Company LLC, Crown Castle International Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to State Court of Notice of Removal)(Wacker, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Castle International Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Crown Castle International for Crown Castle International Corp.. (Wacker, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Castle GT Company LLC identifying Other Affiliate Crown Castle GT, Other Affiliate crown castle International for Crown Castle GT Company LLC. (Wacker, Brian)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County, Illinois, case number 2018L23 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3718825), filed by Crown Castle International Corp., Crown Castle GT Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Court Civil File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wacker, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Columbia, Illinois v. Crown Castle GT Company LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Castle International Corp.
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTE Wireless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Castle GT Company LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Wacker
Represented By: Justin Andrew Welply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Columbia, Illinois
Represented By: David A. Streubel
Represented By: Margaret C. Eveker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?