USA v. Direct Steel, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company and USA
Defendant: Direct Steel, LLC d/b/a Direct Steel and Construction, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Direct Steel, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02072
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Reona J Daly
1 Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case by USA. (Boddy, Elizabeth)
January 2, 2019 Direct Steel, LLC answer due 1/25/2019. (ely)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Defendants Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Direct Steel, LLC are GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 1/25/2019, to file an answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 1/2/2019. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 1/2/2019 (ely).
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation)(Chollet, III, Albert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert L. Chollet, III on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Chollet, III, Albert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Sebastian on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Sebastian, John)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Direct Steel, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. Original summons mailed to Attorney Elizabeth Boddy. (lmb)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Elizabeth Boddy on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/14/2018. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-2072-SMY-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (lmb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Boddy, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Boddy, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Boddy on behalf of United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company (Boddy, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Boddy, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Boddy does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Elizabeth J. Boddy $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3720415 by on behalf of United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company. (Boddy, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Direct Steel, LLC d/b/a Direct Steel and Construction, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3720390.), filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Boddy, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Direct Steel, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Steel, LLC d/b/a Direct Steel and Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: John E. Sebastian
Represented By: Albert L. Chollet, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Steel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Southfield Corporation d/b/a Illinois Brick Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Boddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Boddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?