USA v. Henry et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Nichole L. Henry, State of Illinois Department of Revenue, Mike Henry, Laclede Community Credit Union, Michael A. Henry and Nicole Henry
Case Number: 3:2018cv02099
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Laclede Community Credit Union. (cjo)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Nichole L. Henry waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams no longer assigned to the case. (jaj)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Mike Henry. (cds)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. State of Illinois Department of Revenue waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams assigned. All future documents must bear case number 18-2099-SMY-SCW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (cjo)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of USA (Hanna, Adam)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE by USA (Hanna, Adam)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mike Henry, Nichole L. Henry, Laclede Community Credit Union, State of Illinois Department of Revenue, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Henry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole L. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laclede Community Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?