Thalman v. Medical Business Bureau, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Richard L. Thalman
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Medical Business Bureau, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02171
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard L. Thalman. Medical Business Bureau, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Kolbus, Heather)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Medical Business Bureau, LLC, and returned to Attorney Edelman for service. (kls3)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #1 Complaint filed by Richard L. Thalman. The attached Civil Cover Sheet is in a fillable format which allows changes to be made to the document. Fillable documents should be saved and converted to a non-fillable pdf format before filing in CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:18-cv-2171-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kls3)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Kolbus on behalf of Richard L. Thalman (Kolbus, Heather)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathleen M. Combs on behalf of Richard L. Thalman (Combs, Cathleen)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Richard L. Thalman (Edelman, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Medical Business Bureau, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3746657.), filed by Richard L. Thalman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thalman v. Medical Business Bureau, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Business Bureau, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Richard L. Thalman
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Heather Kolbus
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?