Bradley v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Defendant: Lt. Whitoff, John Doe, C/O Sulser, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Sgt. Jones and C/O Brumleve
Case Number: 3:2019cv00015
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (anp)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING #26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. Plaintiff's allegations do not set forth specific facts demonstrating the likelihood of immediate and irreparable harm before Defendants can be heard. Although Plaintiff indicates that he has missed some medical appointments, he has not shown that he is currently scheduled for appointments that he would miss prior to Defendants responding to his motion. Nor has he shown that the failure to attend these appointments will cause him immediate harm. To the extent that Plaintiff's motion also seeks a preliminary injunction, however, Defendants are DIRECTED to respond to the motion by March 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/4/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/26/2019. (anp)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Request Transcripts. Plaintiff requests a transcript of the February 7, 2019 hearing on Plaintiffs motion for temporary restraining order for the purpose of reviewing and amending his claims. Given Plaintiffs indicated need for the transcript, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion and DIRECTS that the transcript of the February 7, 2019 hearing be prepared by Court Reporter Laura Esposito, filed with the Clerk of Court, and a copy sent to Plaintiff, at the expense of the United States. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/26/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Request Transcripts from the TRO hearing re #20 by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
February 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Deandre Bradley. (jsm2)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/8/2019. (anp)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2019 re #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction/Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. Motion DENIED. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Laura Esposito.) (drb)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $329.26. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 2/6/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 4, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by C/O Brumleve, Sgt. Jones, Sgt. Jones, Jacqueline Lashbrook, C/O Sulser, Lt. Whitoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Schwarzlose, Rachel)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (tjk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel D. Schwarzlose on behalf of C/O Brumleve, Sgt. Jones(White), Sgt. Jones(Black), Jacqueline Lashbrook, C/O Sulser, Lt. Whitoff (Schwarzlose, Rachel)
January 29, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed C/O Brumleve waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Sgt. Jones(White) waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Sgt. Jones(Black) waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Jacqueline Lashbrook waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; C/O Sulser waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Lt. Whitoff waiver sent on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (tjk)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #13 Motion to Inform the Court. The Court will consider Plaintiff's additional allegations related to his request for injunctive relief. To the extent Plaintiff is concerned that he will not be allowed to appear at the February 7, 2019 TRO hearing, the Court has issued a writ for his appearance and he will be present by video for the hearing. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/29/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Inform the Court of Very Important Imformation re #6 Complaint, #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. The Court DIRECTS Jacqueline Lashbrook to respond to the pending motion for preliminary injunction/temporary restraining order by close of business 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/24/2019. (anp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jones, Jones, Whitoff, Sulser, Brumleve, and Lashbrook on 1/24/2019. Waiver of Service due by 2/25/2019. (tjk)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order for Service of Process upon Defendants Sulser, Whitoff, Jones, Jones, Brumleve, and Jacqueline Lashbrook, Jacqueline Lashbrook added for purposes of injunctive relief only. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/24/2019. (jcp)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order [Doc. 1] on February 7, 2019 at 10:30 AM. The Court notes that a similar type of motion is already set in one of Plaintiff's other cases [Case No. 19-cv-23-NJR] at that time, and the Court will take up the issues raised both cases in one hearing. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the Illinois Attorney General. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/24/2019. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 7/1/2018 to 8/30/2018 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Pinckneyville Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 3/4/2019). Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/18/2019. (tjk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT for (TRO) Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, Permenant Injunction and Damagess Appropiately Applied against All Defendants filed by Deandre Bradley.(jaj)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
January 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Complaint due by 2/4/2019. (jaj)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deandre Bradley. On or before February 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a complaint, thereby initiating this action. Failure to file a proper complaint by the prescribed deadline will result in dismissal of this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 1/7/2019. (jcp)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from USDC/SDIL to Plaintiff informing him of case number. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (jaj)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Deandre Bradley. (jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Whitoff
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Sulser
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Jones
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Brumleve
Represented By: Rachel D. Schwarzlose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?