Stacker v. Aargon Agency, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tonya Stacker
Defendant: Aargon Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00078
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
0 Judge: Reona J Daly
1 Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for April, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aargon Agency, Inc..(Kaminski, David)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kaminski on behalf of defendant Aargon Agency, Inc. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J. Kaminski $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3815227 by on behalf of Aargon Agency, Inc.. (Kaminski, David)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ACTION re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Aargon Agency, Inc. Court Records indicate that Attorney Kaminski is not admitted to practice in the Southern District of Illinois; however it appears he was given credentials to file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in a previous case. Attorney Kaminski needs to file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice to enter his appearance. Documentation and instructions for filing Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice can be found at the court's website at www.ilsd.uscourts.gov under Rules & Forms. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Kaminski on behalf of Aargon Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(Kaminski, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ACTION re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aargon Agency, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aargon Agency, Inc. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Kaminski does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Unopposed filed by Aargon Agency, Inc. Defendant Aargon Agency, Inc. shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by 3/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 2/26/2019. (nmf)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aargon Agency, Inc.. (Kaminski, David)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Unopposed by Aargon Agency, Inc.. (Kaminski, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tonya Stacker. Aargon Agency, Inc. served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Badwan, Mohammed)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aargon Agency, Inc. and original mailed to Attorney Badwan. (kdb)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #1 Complaint and #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Tonya Stacker. Other: Civil Cover Sheet, submitted summons, and notice of appearance are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This notice is for informational purposes only. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-78-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kdb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammed O. Badwan on behalf of Tonya Stacker (Badwan, Mohammed)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aargon Agency, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3781568.), filed by Tonya Stacker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Badwan, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stacker v. Aargon Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aargon Agency, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Stacker
Represented By: Mohammed O. Badwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?