The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC v. Pap-R Products Company et al
Plaintiff: The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC
Defendant: Pap-R Products Company and Pap-R-Tainer, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00234
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint by Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Fonda, Nathan)
April 19, 2019 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and Default Judgment Supplemental filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Walters, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Michael Walters Declaration, #3 Affidavit Dave Walters, #4 Exhibit Exhibits to Dave Walters Declaration, #5 Affidavit Bryan Battina, #6 Exhibit Exhibits to Bryan Battina Declaration)(Battina, Bryan)
April 19, 2019 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and Default Judgment Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition filed by Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ware Declaration, #2 Affidavit Vierling Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. A-B to Vierling Declaration, #4 Affidavit Reiter Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. C-G to Reiter Declaration, #6 Affidavit Williams Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. H-I to Williams Declaration, #8 Affidavit Fonda Declaration, #9 Exhibit Ex. 1-5 to Fonda Declaration)(Fonda, Nathan)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Nathan Fonda #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 18, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nathan C. Fonda $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3861446 by on behalf of Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Fonda, Nathan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2019 re #22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and Default Judgment. Bryan Battina appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Michael Parks and David Jinkins appeared on behalf of Defendants. Motion DENIED as to the issue of default judgment and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT as to the remaining issues. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by April 26, 2019. The parties may submit supplemental briefs by April 19, 2019. (Court Reporter Molly Clayton.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 11, 2019 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and Default Judgment filed by Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Scott Ware, #2 Exhibit A-C to the Declaration of Scott Ware, #3 Affidavit of Micheal A. Parks, #4 Exhibit to the Declaration of Michael A. Parks)(Braunel, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Attorney David Jinkins #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Unassigned on 4/11/2019. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 11, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #42 Notice of Appearance filed by Pap-R-Tainer, LLC, Pap-R Products Company. Document stricken per filer's request. Incorrect document attached. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 11, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David B. Jinkins $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3854418 by on behalf of Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Jinkins, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 42 STRICKEN NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Jinkins on behalf of Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC (Jinkins, David) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kdb).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING #34 Motion for Status Conference. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order will take place on Friday, April 12, 2019, as set forth in the Court's previous Order at Doc. 31. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/10/2019. (jmp2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Michael Parks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 10, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A. Parks $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3852469 by on behalf of Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Parks, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for status re 31 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Battina, Bryan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #34 Motion for Status, filed by Pap-R-Tainer, LLC, Pap-R Products Company. Docket text has been modified to correctly reflect the heading on motion. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #33 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer is now due on or before April 23, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/10/2019. (jmp2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 9, 2019 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Braunel, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for status Conference Regarding Expedited Discovery and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restaining Order 31 . by Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Braunel, Matthew) Modified on 4/10/2019 (amv).
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time by Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (Braunel, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Braunel on behalf of Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC (Braunel, Matthew)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court SETS the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order at Doc. #22 for hearing to take place on Friday, April 12, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. As to the request for default judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b) (Doc. #22 ), the Court DENIES that request as premature at this time. A plaintiff must first move for and obtain a Clerk's entry of default under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Only once that motion has been granted, may a plaintiff move for default judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/5/2019. (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Carpenter on behalf of All Defendants (Carpenter, Mark)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion by Attorney Mark Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 5, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark J. Carpenter $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3847898 by on behalf of All Defendants. (Carpenter, Mark)
April 5, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL: The record indicates Defendants Pap-R-Products Company and Pap-R-Tainer, LLC have been served, yet failed to file an answer or otherwise plead in response to the complaint. Therefore, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that this case will be dismissed for want of prosecution unless Plaintiff moves for a clerk's entry of default under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) within 21 days. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/5/2019. (jmp2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 4, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT re #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration of Bryan Battina by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16)(Battina, Bryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration on Michael Walters by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Battina, Bryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion Declaration of Dave Walters by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L)(Battina, Bryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and Default Judgment filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Battina, Bryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order and Default Judgment by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Battina, Bryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Battina, Bryan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Pap-R-Tainer, LLC served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Battina, Bryan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Pap-R Products Company served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Battina, Bryan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #16 Return of Service Executed filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Plaintiff shall re-file the return using the correct relief Summons Retuned Executed; which can be found at Civil/Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #15 Return of Service Executed filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Plaintiff shall re-file the return using the correct relief Summons Retuned Executed; which can be found at Civil/Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process/Summons Returned Executed. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC on 03/07/2019. (Battina, Bryan) Modified on 3/29/2019 (amv).
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 STRICKEN RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC on 03/07/2019. (Battina, Bryan) Modified on 3/29/2019 (amv).
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC.(Battina, Bryan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #10 Amended Document filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Counsel shall use the correct relief of Amended Complaint. Also, document was signed by Attorney Battina and filed by Attorney Tatoian. Party filer and signature must match. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan R. Battina. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan R. Battina $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3812389 by on behalf of The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. (Battina, Bryan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Tatoian, Sandra) Modified on 2/28/2019 (amv).
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 AO 120 Report of Filing (amv)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. Exhibit to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Tatoian, Sandra)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pap-R Products Company and Pap-R-Tainer, LLC. (amv)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filed as an attachment to the Complaint as instructed. The Civil Cover sheet must be filed using the event found under Civil > Other Documents > Exhibit and linked back to the Complaint docket entry. (amv)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-234-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra J. Tatoian on behalf of The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC (Tatoian, Sandra)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested. (Tatoian, Sandra)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested. (Tatoian, Sandra)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pap-R Products Company, Pap-R-Tainer, LLC, filed by The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC.(Tatoian, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC v. Pap-R Products Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Coin-Tainer Company, LLC
Represented By: Sandra J. Tatoian
Represented By: Bryan R. Battina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pap-R Products Company
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Matthew A. Braunel
Represented By: Nathan C. Fonda
Represented By: Michael A. Parks
Represented By: Mark J. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pap-R-Tainer, LLC
Represented By: David B. Jinkins
Represented By: Matthew A. Braunel
Represented By: Nathan C. Fonda
Represented By: Michael A. Parks
Represented By: Mark J. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?