Castic v. Comenity Bank

Plaintiff: Cathy Castic
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Case Number: 3:2019cv00257
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cathy Castic (Chami, David)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 60 DAY ORDER. Judgment to enter 5/23/2019. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/21/2019. (jdh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Cathy Castic (Chami, David)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cathy Castic. Comenity Bank served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Chami, David)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Comenity Bank. (cds)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-257-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent brochure)(cds)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Chami on behalf of Cathy Castic (Chami, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comenity Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3814400.), filed by Cathy Castic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chami, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castic v. Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Castic
Represented By: David A. Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?