Galloway v. Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Galloway
Defendant: Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00264
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
2 Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/18/2019. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 2:45 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call 888-273-3658. The access code is 1770924. The security code is 2640. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call. (jlm)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Jury Trial month set for January 2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(drb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H. Kass on behalf of Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc. (Kass, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc..(Kass, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Woodrow on behalf of Jason Galloway (Woodrow, Steven)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick H. Peluso on behalf of Jason Galloway (Peluso, Patrick)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/6/2019. (jdh)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc. (amv)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-264-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (Class Action) against Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3816175.), filed by Jason Galloway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS- Galloway, #2 Summons Summons Request for Marathon)(Halvorsen, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Galloway
Represented By: Joel S. Halvorsen
Represented By: Steven L. Woodrow
Represented By: Patrick H. Peluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Financial Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?