Geerds v. TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Joergen Geerds
Defendant: TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00335
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE re #14 Memorandum & Opinion, Order Transferring Case to Other District: Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:19-cv-03424, filed 05/21/2019. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joergen Geerds (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 17, 2019 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of Illinois (rah)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Court GRANTS the motion to transfer (ECF No. #11 ) and ORDERS that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/16/2019. (jdh)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading now due by 5/16/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/2/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #11 Motion to Transfer Case filed by TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC. When pleadings contain multiple attorney signatures, the non-filing attorney must include the language "with consent" with his/her signature. See Section 2.1 of the CM/ECF User's Manual. This notice is for informational purposes and therefore no action is required. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC. (Steege, Catherine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC. (Steege, Catherine)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/27/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 6/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. (tag)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 9:45 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty. Joint Report of the Parties due seven days prior to the conference. The parties are reminded that the proposed discovery and dispositive motions deadlines must be in compliance with the requirements set forth in this Court's form order. See also SDIL-LR 7.1(f) and Timetable. Instructions for placing the conference call are as follows: Call toll free 877-336-1829; when prompted enter Access Code 4442281; followed by Security Code 3352. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/26/2019. (arf)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/27/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 6/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading now due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 4/18/2019. (jer)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC. (Steege, Catherine)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 AO121 Notice Regarding Copyright (amv)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC. Original sent to counsel for Plaintiff for service. (amv)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-335-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3834860.), filed by Joergen Geerds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geerds v. TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joergen Geerds
Represented By: Richard M. Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TreeTop Wealth Management, LLC
Represented By: Catherine L. Steege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?