Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Groundworks Contracting, Inc.
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund and Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Defendant: Groundworks Contracting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00365
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kimmey, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Kimmey, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #8 Clerk's Entry of Default (Kimmey, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Groundworks Contracting, Inc. (cds)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Groundworks Contracting, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kimmey, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Groundworks Contracting, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Kimmey, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kimmey, James)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Groundworks Contracting, Inc. Original mailed to Plaintiff for service. (amv)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-365-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3843091.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Kimmey, James)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Kimmey, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kimmey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund et al v. Groundworks Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers & Cement Masons #90 Pension Fund
Represented By: James R. Kimmey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groundworks Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?