Sanks v. Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553
Plaintiff: John R Sanks
Defendant: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553
Case Number: 3:2019cv00381
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint see Doc. #29 by John R Sanks. (amv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to dismiss #17 - Response filed by John R Sanks. (amv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John R Sanks. (amv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Sanctions (response) re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John R Sanks. (amv)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by John R Sanks. (amv)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. This matter comes before the Court for case management. As of this date, Sanks has not filed a response to the June 12, 2019 motion for sanctions. Under Local Rule 7.1(g), Sanks had fourteen days to respond to the motion. Thus, the Court DIRECTS Sanks to file a response to the motion for sanctions on or before July 15, 2019. The Court notes that the failure to respond to the motion "may, in the Court's discretion, be considered an admission of the merits of the motion" and may result in the dismissal of his case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/8/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C to Memorandum)(Martin, Janine)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Sanctions by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Martin, Janine)
June 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0381. (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Discovery due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Report of Parties)(dmw2)
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/11/2019. Pro Se Plaintiff, John R. Sanks, present. Attorney Janine Martin present on behalf of Defendant. The Joint Report of the Parties will be adopted. Should the parties seek to amend the trial date, a written motion will be required. The Parties are reminded of the option of consenting to the magistrate judge. By separate notice, a status conference will be set at a later date. Plaintiff indicates that he has not received a copy of the Motion to Dismiss at Doc. 17. Attorney Martin is directed to resend Documents 17 & 18 to Plaintiff via regular mail and email. Plaintiff is granted an extension within which to respond to this Motion. Plaintiff's response is due 07/15/2019. (dmw2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0381. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/9/2019. (dmw2)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Martin, Janine)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Martin, Janine)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Martin, Janine)
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553, filed by John R Sanks. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manual Filing, #2 Envelope)(amv)
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/17/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Bench Trial date of 6/29/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Janine M. Martin on behalf of Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553.. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Janine M. Martin $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3863761 by on behalf of Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553. (Martin, Janine)
April 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by John R Sanks. (kdb)
April 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to retain new counsel Action due by 5/2/2019. (trb)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Deborah A. Arbogast terminated. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(g), Sanks, who is now proceeding pro se, should retain new counsel and on or before May 2, 2019 Sanks or new counsel shall file a supplementary appearance that provides an address at which the party and/or the new counsel may receive service of documents related to the Case. The Court DIRECTS Ms. Abrogast to serve Sanks with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/10/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John R Sanks. (Arbogast, Deborah)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying at this time the #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. A review of the motion reveals that counsel did not follow Local Rule 83.1(g) in filing the motion. Counsel is free to file another motion to withdraw that comports with Local Rule 83.1(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 4/9/2019. (klh)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by John R Sanks. (Arbogast, Deborah)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS by John R Sanks to #1 Complaint. (amv)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553 and returned to attorney for service. (trb)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Arbogast on behalf of John R Sanks (Arbogast, Deborah)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Arbogast does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-381-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(trb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3848255.), filed by John R Sanks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Arbogast, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanks v. Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 553
Represented By: Janine M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R Sanks
Represented By: Deborah A. Arbogast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?