Peck v. Southern Illinois Hospital Services et al
Plaintiff: Richard Neal Peck
Defendant: ClaimAssist, LLC and Southern Illinois Hospital Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00383
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
2 Judge: Gilbert C Sison
3 Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Counsel may participate via telephone conference. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0383. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/17/2019. (dmw2)
June 13, 2019 Filing 24 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 1:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(slh)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff filed by Southern Illinois Hospital Services. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Illinois Hospital Services. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File by ClaimAssist, LLC. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Remand filed by ClaimAssist, LLC. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by ClaimAssist, LLC of Corporate Disclosure Statement (Mitchell, Jonathan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Neal Peck. (Murphy, G.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand by Richard Neal Peck. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Murphy, G.)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Southern Illinois Hospital Services. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Southern Illinois Hospital Services. Responses due by 5/23/2019 (Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Hampson on behalf of Richard Neal Peck (Hampson, Theodore)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Patrick Murphy on behalf of Richard Neal Peck (Murphy, G.)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/9/2019. (ely)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara L. Jones on behalf of ClaimAssist, LLC (Jones, Kara)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Mitchell on behalf of ClaimAssist, LLC (Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Southern Illinois Hospital Services of Acceptance by State Court of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice from the State Court of Removal)(Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/8/2019. (drb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Schultz on behalf of Southern Illinois Hospital Services (Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION: See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the Court. Attorney Schultz does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kls3)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND ENTRY OF APPEARANCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1446, this case was removed from state court to this U.S. District Court. Section 1446(a) delineates the procedure for removing a case from state court to federal court and requires, inter alia, that the removing defendant furnish a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served upon such defendant. Because a jury may be demanded in a state court pleading that is not served upon the defendant(s) (e.g., an answer or a separately-filed jury demand), and this Courts civil cover sheet instructs attorneys to check the Jury Demand box only if a jury was requested in the complaint, the Court hereby DIRECTS the removing defendant(s) to file as a Supplement to Notice of Removal a copy of any state court answer or other pleading/paper which contains a jury demand OR a one-line statement that no jury was demanded by any party prior to removal. If a jury demand appears in the federal case record, no Supplement to Notice of Removal need be filed. In addition, attorneys are reminded that they must file a formal entry of appearance in this case. The removing defendant(s) shall comply with this directive within 14 days from the date of this Order. Supplement to Notice of Removal due by 4/19/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 4/5/2019. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-383-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(kls3)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald M. Flack, Jr. on behalf of Southern Illinois Hospital Services (Flack, Jr., Donald)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Illinois Hospital Services identifying Corporate Parent Southern Illinois Healthcare Enterprises, Inc. for Southern Illinois Hospital Services. (Schultz, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County, case number 2019-MR-23 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3848361), filed by Southern Illinois Hospital Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit ClaimAssist, LLC Consent to Removal)(Schultz, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peck v. Southern Illinois Hospital Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Neal Peck
Represented By: G. Patrick Murphy
Represented By: Theodore J. Hampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClaimAssist, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Mitchell
Represented By: Kara L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Illinois Hospital Services
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Schultz
Represented By: Donald M. Flack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?