Joost v. American Commercial Barge Line LLC
Plaintiff: Jeremy Joost
Defendant: American Commercial Barge Line LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00391
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Office: East St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 Docket Annotation per notification from the Eastern District of Louisiana case incorrectly transferred. Case should have been transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (kdb)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01172. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 Letter to Eastern District of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Trail By Magistrate Judge form, #2 Consent Brochure) (kdb)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING #5 MOTION to to transfer venue. Case transferred to Southern District of Indiana, New Albany Division. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/8/2019.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by American Commercial Barge Line LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/2/2019. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, To Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge Division. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Division 3 Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jeremy Joost re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5)(Taylor, Ian) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/20/2019.(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue. **Document contains incorrect name of Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss For Improper Venue Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3), Or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by American Commercial Barge Line LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)Attorney Lauren A. Guichard added to party American Commercial Barge Line LLC(pty:dft).(Guichard, Lauren) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SEAMAN COMPLAINT against American Commercial Barge Line LLC filed by Jeremy Joost.(Aamodt, Jodi) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against American Commercial Barge Line LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7413379) filed by Jeremy Joost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Jodi Jacobs Aamodt added to party Jeremy Joost(pty:pla).(Aamodt, Jodi) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joost v. American Commercial Barge Line LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Joost
Represented By: Stanley Joseph Jacobs
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Jodi Jacobs Aamodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Commercial Barge Line LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Lauren A. Guichard
Represented By: Danica Benbow Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?