Lisle v. Lawrence et al

Plaintiff: Steven D. Lisle and Steven D. Lisle, Jr.
Defendant: Sergeant Jones, Nurse MarryAnn, Officer Porter, Taylor, Frank Lawrence, Luitenet Bridges, John/Jane Doe, Wine, Dr. Levey, Luitenet G and Unknown Party
Case Number: 3:2019cv00427
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint for good caused shown. Defendants Bridges, Jones, Lawrence, Porter, and Wine shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/24/2019. (jsy) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Luitenet Bridges, Sergeant Jones, Frank Lawrence, Officer Porter, Wine. (Andrews, Philip)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/19/2019. (jsy)
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven D. Lisle, Jr. (jaj)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff indicates that he recently transferred from Menard Correctional Center to Dixon Correctional Center, rendering his motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief temporarily moot. He seeks to withdraw the motion, and his request is granted. Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff renewing this request for interim relief if it becomes necessary to do so in this case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/19/2019. (jsy)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. (Cohen, Edward)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order by Dr. Levey. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dr. Levey.(Kinkade, Jaclyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dr. Levey. (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Kinkade on behalf of Dr. Levey (Kinkade, Jaclyn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy P. Dugan on behalf of Dr. Levey (Dugan, Timothy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip John Andrews on behalf of Luitenet Bridges, Sergeant Jones, Frank Lawrence, Officer Porter, Wine (Andrews, Philip)
May 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Action due by 6/19/2019. (cds)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Proceedings on Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's counsel seeks an indefinite extension of the May 20, 2019 deadline to file a brief in support of the pending 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction because Plaintiff is temporarily housed at another facility in the Illinois Department of Corrections and counsel has been unable to meet with him in person. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for an indefinite extension of this deadline but GRANTS a 30-day extension. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, he must file a supporting brief within thirty (30) days (on or before June 19, 2019). Failure to do so by this deadline will result in dismissal of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction without prejudice. Should Plaintiff file a supporting brief by the deadline set forth herein, Defendant(s) will have fourteen (14) days to file a Response. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2019. (jsy)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Proceedings on the Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. (Cohen, Edward)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order STRIKING #15 Motion for Leave to File Instanter Proposed Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent Retaliation Excessive Force & Sexual Assault. Plaintiff is now represented by counsel. (Doc. 13). In the Court's Order Appointing Counsel, Plaintiff was instructed to refrain from filing anything in this case now that he is represented. The Court identified two exceptions: (1) a pleading asking that counsel withdraw from representation; and (2) a motion for temporary restraining order, if necessary, "before Plaintiff's attorney file[d] a notice of appearance." (Doc. 7). Plaintiff filed the instant motion after his attorney filed a notice of appearance, and it does not constitute a request that counsel withdraw or a motion for temporary restraining order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. 15) and RETURN the Motion and proposed brief to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/2/2019. (jsy)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 1, 2019 Filing 15 STRICKEN - MOTION for Leave to File Instanter Proposed Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent Retaliation Excessive Force & Sexual Assault by Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. Proposed Amicus Brief received and under review. (jaj) Modified on 5/3/2019 (cds).
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiff has been without funds for six months, he is currently without funds, and he appears to have no means currently with which to pay an initial partial filing fee. Accordingly, the Court will not assess an initial partial filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Menard Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/1/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Abraham Cohen on behalf of Steven D. Lisle, Jr. (Cohen, Edward)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Dr. Levey waiver sent on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (tjk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jaj)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Luitenet Bridges waiver sent on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Sergeant Jones waiver sent on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Frank Lawrence waiver sent on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Officer Porter waiver sent on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Wine waiver sent on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (tjk)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ("IFP") in this case (see Doc. #2 ), but has failed to provide the necessary prisoner trust fund account information as required by the PLRA to determine whether the inmate is entitled to proceed without prepaying fees and costs. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), the Court must review the prisoner trust fund account statement for the 6 month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk of Court with the attached certification completed by the Trust Fund Officer at the facility and a copy of his/her trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the period 10/1/2018 to 4/16/2019 no later than 45 days from the date of this order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). See generally Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994). The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and the certification form to the Trust Fund Officer at Menard Correctional Center. (Trust Fund Statement due on or before 6/10/2019). Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 6/10/2019. (tjk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jones, Lawrence, Wine, Levey, Porter, and Bridges on 4/22/2019. Waiver of Service due by 5/22/2019. (tjk)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1) and Local Rule(s) 83.1(i), attorney Edward A. Cohen of Thompson Coburn, LLP located at One U.S. Bank Plaza - Suite 2600, St. Louis, MO 63101, is ASSIGNED to represent Plaintiff in this civil rights case. On or before May 6, 2019, assigned counsel shall enter his appearance in this case and make contact with Plaintiff according to the deadlines and instructions set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/22/2019. (jsy)
April 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 5/20/2019. (jaj)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. See Order at #5 . (jaj)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS upon FRANK LAWRENCE, LIEUTENANT BRIDGES, WINE, OFFICER PORTER, SERGEANT / OFFICER JONES, DR. LEVEY, LIEUTENANT G (once identified), and OFFICER DOES (once identified). COUNTS 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 are SEVERED into a new case. The only claims remaining in this action are COUNTS 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, and 11 against Defendants FRANK LAWRENCE, LIEUTENANT G., LIEUTENANT BRIDGES, WINE, OFFICER PORTER, SERGEANT/OFFICER JONES, DR. LEVEY, and OFFICER DOES. COUNTS 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, and 11 survive screening against the defendants named in connection with each of these claims in the attached Order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to MODIFY the case caption, TERMINATE dismissed defendants, and ADD a Motion for Preliminary Injunction in CM/ECF according to the instructions set forth in this Order. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, he must file a supporting brief within thirty (30) days (on or before May 20, 2019). Failure to do so by this deadline will result in dismissal of the motion without prejudice. Should Plaintiff file a Brief in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction as directed by the Court, Defendant(s) will then have fourteen (14) days to file any Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/19/2019. (jsy)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-427-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/16/2019. (jaj)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Steven D. Lisle, Jr. (jaj)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven D. Lisle, Jr.. (jaj)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Steven D. Lisle, Jr. .(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisle v. Lawrence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jones
Represented By: Philip John Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse MarryAnn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Porter
Represented By: Philip John Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lawrence
Represented By: Philip John Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luitenet Bridges
Represented By: Philip John Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wine
Represented By: Philip John Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Levey
Represented By: Timothy P. Dugan
Represented By: Jaclyn Kinkade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luitenet G
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Lisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D. Lisle, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Abraham Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?