Jones v. Combe Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Telly Jones
Defendant: Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Incorporated, Combe Products, Inc. and Combe International LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00434
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: In light of the Order re Settlement Agreement and Deadlines (see In re: Just for Men Mass Tort Litigation, Case No. 16-cv-638, Doc. 80), all pending motions are TERMINATED as MOOT and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/20/2019. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The briefing deadlines on the pending motions are EXTENDED by 30 days. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/1/2019. (mah). THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G. Strauss on behalf of All Defendants (Strauss, Stephen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Combe International LLC. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strauss, Stephen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss as an Improper Party by Combe Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strauss, Stephen)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Combe Incorporated, Combe Products, Inc..(Strauss, Stephen)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for all further proceedings. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/22/2019. (jdh)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lloyd M. Cueto on behalf of Telly Jones (Cueto, Lloyd)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-434-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC f/k/a Combe International Ltd, Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc.. (Strauss, Stephen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County, case number 19-L-179 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3862134), filed by Combe Laboratories, Inc., Combe Products, Inc., Combe Incorporated, Combe International LLC f/k/a Combe International Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet)(Strauss, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Combe Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe Products, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combe International LLC
Represented By: Stephen G. Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telly Jones
Represented By: Lloyd M. Cueto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?