Newton Partners, LP v. Fundi Fuels, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Newton Partners, LP
Defendant: Fundi Fuels, LLC, Brandon D. Phillips Living Trust Dated August 8, 2005 and Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Case Number: 3:2019cv00477
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Wernsman on behalf of Brandon D. Phillips Living Trust Dated August 8, 2005 (Wernsman, Brian)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Wernsman does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brandon D. Phillips Living Trust Dated August 8, 2005.(Wernsman, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Newton Partners, LP. Fundi Fuels, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Hall, Carrie)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Newton Partners, LP. Brandon D. Phillips Living Trust Dated August 8, 2005 served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Hall, Carrie)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendants by Publication filed by Newton Partners, LP. Action due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty on 5/24/2019. (jer)
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Serve Defendants by Publication by Newton Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hall, Carrie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT for Service by Publication by Newton Partners, LP. (Hall, Carrie)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Fundi Fuels, LLC. original sent to Plaintiff for service (amv)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Brandon D. Phillips Living Trust Dated August 8, 2005. (cds)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-477-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cds)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested. (Hall, Carrie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newton Partners, LP. (Hall, Carrie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie A. Hall on behalf of Newton Partners, LP (Hall, Carrie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Mortgage Foreclosure and Other Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3872031.), filed by Newton Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Hall, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton Partners, LP v. Fundi Fuels, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fundi Fuels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon D. Phillips Living Trust Dated August 8, 2005
Represented By: Brian C. Wernsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newton Partners, LP
Represented By: Carrie A. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?