Buehlhorn v. Phillips 66 Company et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Buehlhorn
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company and URS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00478
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Grey R. Chatham, Sr. on behalf of Joshua Buehlhorn (Chatham, Sr., Grey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #19 by Joshua Buehlhorn. (Chatham, Sr., Grey)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time. A response to the #15 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is now due on or before July 24, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/3/2019. (bak)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant URS Corporation's answer is deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 6/3/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 31, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by URS Corporation.(Reis, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by URS Corporation. (Reis, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Joshua Buehlhorn. (Chatham, Sr., Grey)
May 22, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Phillips 66 Company. (Cooper, Ian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Phillips 66 Company. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Cooper, Ian)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by URS Corporation. Proposed order was attached to the main document. Proposed documents are not to be filed, but rather submitted via e-mail to the Court (see CM/ECF Users Manual at pgs. 2.6-2.7). Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Courts practices. Proposed documents need to be e-mailed to the proper judge. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant URS Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond on or before May 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/16/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Chatham on behalf of Plaintiff Joshua Buehlhorn. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by URS Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Reis, Charles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Reis, IV on behalf of URS Corporation (Reis, Charles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Grey R. Chatham, Sr. $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3881094 by on behalf of Joshua Buehlhorn. (Chatham, Sr., Grey)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Phillips 66 Company shall answer or otherwise respond on or before May 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 5/9/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian P. Cooper on behalf of Phillips 66 Company (Cooper, Ian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ACTION re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Phillips 66 Company. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Cooper does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kdb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Phillips 66 Company. (Cooper, Ian)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-478-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kdb)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M. Lakamp on behalf of Phillips 66 Company (Lakamp, Jenna)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 Company identifying Corporate Parent Phillips 66 for Phillips 66 Company. (Cooper, Ian)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Clair County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-0230 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3872159), filed by Phillips 66 Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal to Circuit Clerk, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Jennifer Garcia, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration for Removal from URS, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buehlhorn v. Phillips 66 Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Ian P. Cooper
Represented By: Jenna M. Lakamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS Corporation
Represented By: Charles E. Reis, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Buehlhorn
Represented By: Grey R. Chatham, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?