Padin v. Officer Justin Kempfer et al
Plaintiff: Luis Padin
Defendant: Officer Kramer, Officer Dane T. Wells, Officer John Powell, Officer Christopher Roth, Officer Sean A. Starkweather, John Doe Correctional Officers, Sgt. Tyler Jones, Officer Joshua Meade, Officer Justin Kempfer, Officer John Carawa, Officer Bradley Warhausen, Internal Affairs Officer Lance Phelps, Officer Wesley Cowan, Officer Dudzinski, Lance Phelps, Justin Kempfer, Kramer, Wesley Cowan, John Carawa, Joshua Meade, John Doe, Dane T. Wells, John Powell, Frank Lawrence, Tyler Jones, Sean A Starkweather, Christopher Roth, Dudzinski and Bradley Warhausen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00504
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by John Carawa, Wesley Cowan, Dudzinski, Tyler Jones, Justin Kempfer, Kramer, Joshua Meade, Lance Phelps, John Powell, Christopher Roth, Sean A Starkweather, Bradley Warhausen, Dane T. Wells. (Gray, Maria)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Frank Lawrence waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria D. Gray on behalf of John Carawa, Wesley Cowan, Dudzinski, Tyler Jones, Justin Kempfer, Kramer, Frank Lawrence, Joshua Meade, Lance Phelps, John Powell, Christopher Roth, Sean A Starkweather, Bradley Warhausen, Dane T. Wells (Gray, Maria)
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Wesley Cowan waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Tyler Jones waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Sean A Starkweather waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Lance Phelps waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. John Powell waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Joshua Meade waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Justin Kempfer waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Dudzinski waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. John Carawa waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Kramer waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Dane T. Wells waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Christopher Roth waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Padin. Bradley Warhausen waiver sent on 5/14/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Orozco, Brian)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that COUNT 1 shall receive further review as to KEMPFER, DUDZINSKI, WARHAUSEN, WELLS, POWELL, ROTH, CARAWA, MEADE, COWAN, STARKWEATHER, KRAMER, JONES, and JOHN DOES, and COUNT 2 shall receive further review as to KEMPFER, DUDZINSKI, WARHAUSEN, WELLS, POWELL, ROTH, CARAWA, MEADE, COWAN, STARKWEATHER, KRAMER, JONES, JOHN DOES, and PHELPS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADD FRANK LAWRENCE, ACTING WARDEN OF MENARD CORRECTIONAL CENTER (official capacity only), as a defendant in the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system for the purposes of responding to discovery aimed at identifying the unknown defendants. Plaintiff's counsel will be responsible for completing service of process in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/16/2019. (jrj)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-504-NJR. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure).(jsm2)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. Kulis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attorney's Lien)(Kulis, Gregory)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Orozco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orozco, Brian)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3880084.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padin v. Officer Justin Kempfer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dane T. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Sean A. Starkweather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Tyler Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joshua Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Justin Kempfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Carawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bradley Warhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Affairs Officer Lance Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wesley Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dudzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Phelps
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Kempfer
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramer
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Cowan
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carawa
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Meade
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane T. Wells
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Powell
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Lawrence
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Jones
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean A Starkweather
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Roth
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudzinski
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Warhausen
Represented By: Maria D. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Padin
Represented By: Brian M. Orozco
Represented By: Gregory E. Kulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?