Reynolds v. US Attorneys Office
Petitioner: Michael Curtis Reynolds
Respondent: US Attorneys Office
Case Number: 3:2019cv00524
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred from Illinois Southern has been opened in Middle District of Pennsylvania as case 3:19-cv-00915. (trb)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jsm2)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Case was electronically transferred to the Middle District of Pennsylvania. (jsm2)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 5/28/2019. (jsy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Petitioner advising of case number. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate).(jsm2)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Curtis Reynolds. (jsm2)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Michael Curtis Reynolds.(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. US Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Curtis Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?