Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Red Apple Lounge Inc et al
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Red Apple Lounge, Main Moore, Terrell M. Culpepper, Abdul Hakim Muhammad and Red Apple Lounge Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00567
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Reissued as to Main Moore, Abdul Hakim Muhammad. (cds)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0567. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 7/17/2019. (dmw2)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re #16 by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Oehmke, Kyle)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 10:30 AM and Bench Trial set for 9/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge Staci M. Yandle. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge)(slh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Red Apple Lounge Inc.(Hoerner, Kevin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Andrew Hoerner on behalf of Red Apple Lounge Inc (Hoerner, Kevin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Red Apple Lounge Inc served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Terrell M. Culpepper served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Terrell M. Culpepper, Main Moore, Abdul Hakim Muhammad, Red Apple Lounge Inc. (cds)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested. (Oehmke, Kyle)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney, John E. DeLascio on 6/5/2019. (cds)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John E. DeLascio $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3896787 by on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (DeLascio, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-cv-567-SMY-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 consent brochure)(cds)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. Exhibit to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment. (Oehmke, Kyle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle C. Oehmke on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Oehmke, Kyle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3893694.), filed by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Oehmke, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company v. Red Apple Lounge Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Apple Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell M. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul Hakim Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Apple Lounge Inc
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Hoerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle C. Oehmke
Represented By: John E. DeLascio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?