Walters v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Tom Walters
Defendant: John R Baldwin, Michael D Clark, Kevin Kink and John R. Baldwin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00631
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for status by Tom Walters. (kdw)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tom Walters.(jaj)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REOPENING CASE: Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Reopen Case is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REOPEN THIS CASE and to REINSTATE Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Motion for Recruitment of Counsel, and #4 Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense. The Court will conduct a preliminary screening of the #1 Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 7/17/2019. (jrj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Reopen Case by Tom Walters. (jaj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order by Tom Walters. (jaj)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case. Plaintiff has filed a Motion seeking leave to voluntarily dismiss this action (Doc. #8 ). Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) allows dismissal without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. As such a notice has been filed, no order of the court is necessary. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B), the dismissal is without prejudice. All pending motions, Motion for Recruitment of Counsel #3 and Motion for Service of Process at Government Expense #4 , are DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff is ADVISED that he incurred the obligation to pay the filing fee for a lawsuit when the suit was filed, and the obligation continues regardless of later developments in the suit, such as dismissal of the suit or denial of leave to proceed IFP. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), (e)(2); Lucien v. Jockisch, 133 F.3d 464, 467 (7th Cir. 1998).The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/28/2019. (jrj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 26, 2019 Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 25.75 received, receipt number 34625094019 (amv)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Case by Tom Walters. (jaj)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc. #2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $25.75. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Lawrence Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/17/2019. (tjk)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-631-NJR. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/10/2019. (jaj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Tom Walters. (jaj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Tom Walters. (jaj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tom Walters. (jaj)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tom Walters.(jaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?