Lewis v. Irvington Elevator Co. et al
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Lewis
Defendant: Tim Seidel and Irvington Elevator Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00759
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0759. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 8/22/2019. (dmw2)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Marie Tenuto on behalf of All Defendants (Tenuto, Julie)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/7/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 10/19/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Irvington Elevator Co.. (LeMoine, Bryan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by All Defendants.(LeMoine, Bryan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. O'Neal on behalf of All Defendants (O'Neal, Brian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D. LeMoine on behalf of All Defendants (LeMoine, Bryan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa A. Lewis. Tim Seidel served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa A. Lewis. Irvington Elevator Co. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Wolf, Ferne)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Daniels on behalf of Theresa A. Lewis (Daniels, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tim Seidel. (amv)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Irvington Elevator Co.. (amv)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-759-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(amv)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ferne P. Wolf on behalf of Theresa A. Lewis (Wolf, Ferne)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Irvington Elevator Co., Tim Seidel ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3927145.), filed by Theresa A. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (2017SF3501 Charge of Discrimination), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (2017SN3502 Charge of Discrimination), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (IDHR_2017SF3501 Notice of Substantial Evidence), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 (IDHR_2017SN3502 Notice of Substantial Evidence), #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 (EEOC Notice of Right to Sue), #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Irvington Elevator Co. Summons, #8 Summons Tim Seidel Summons)(Wolf, Ferne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Irvington Elevator Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Lewis
Represented By: Ferne P. Wolf
Represented By: Christopher B. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Seidel
Represented By: Julie Marie Tenuto
Represented By: Brian M. O'Neal
Represented By: Bryan D. LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvington Elevator Co.
Represented By: Julie Marie Tenuto
Represented By: Brian M. O'Neal
Represented By: Bryan D. LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?