USA v. $178,265.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: $178,265.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00813
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Reona J Daly
Referring Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Claim. Eduard Zavlunov is GRANTED an extension of time, up to and including 10/16/2019, to file a claim in response to the Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 9/16/2019. (ely)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Notice (Other) by $178,265.00 in United States Currency. (Cohen, David)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by $178,265.00 in United States Currency, #10 Motion for Extension of Time filed by $178,265.00 in United States Currency. Documents stricken, per chambers. Filer to re-file using proper pleading format. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Notice (Other) by $178,265.00 in United States Currency. (Cohen, David) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kls3).
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN. MOTION for Extension of Time by $178,265.00 in United States Currency. (Cohen, David) Modified on 9/13/2019 (kls3).
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Cohen on behalf of $178,265.00 in United States Currency (Cohen, David)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Cohen on behalf of Defendant. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J. Cohen $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-3975808 by on behalf of $178,265.00 in United States Currency. (Cohen, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by USA on 08/14/2019. (Hanna, Adam)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Warrant for Arrest of Articles in REM Issued (kek)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by USA re #1 Complaint (Direct Notice of Civil Judicial Forfeiture) (Hanna, Adam)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-813-NJR-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(kls3)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $178,265.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $178,265.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $178,265.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?