Markus et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TAMMY MARKUS and RYAN MARKUS
Defendant: LOANCARE, LLC and LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00876
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC.(Ostroff, Ethan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Loancare, LLC.(Ostroff, Ethan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison. Instructions for the conference call are as follows: (1) call toll-free, 888-273-3658; (2) when prompted, enter the seven-digit Access Code: 5699758; (3) when prompted, enter the four-digit Security Code: 0876. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 9/13/2019. (dmw2)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/2/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 9/14/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loancare, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNF Servicing, Inc. for Loancare, LLC. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bayview MSR Opportunity Corp. for Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Ostroff, Ethan)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint on or before October 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 9/3/19. (kll)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Loancare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Order)(Ostroff, Ethan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Loancare, LLC (Ostroff, Ethan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, Loancare, LLC. (cjo)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-876-JPG-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Maxwell, Jr. on behalf of RYAN MARKUS, TAMMY MARKUS (Maxwell, Jr., Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of RYAN MARKUS, TAMMY MARKUS (Cohron, Travis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3950990.), filed by RYAN MARKUS, TAMMY MARKUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A Partial Loan Hx, #4 Exhibit B 2.9.2019 Delinquent Notice, #5 Exhibit C Annual Escrow 9.21.2017, #6 Exhibit D 1.14.2019 Default Letter, #7 Exhibit E 1.22.2019 Loancare Letter, #8 Exhibit F 3.18.2019 Payment Reminder Notice, #9 Exhibit G 4.17.2019 Payment Reminder Notice, #10 Exhibit H 4.16.2019 Monthly Statement, #11 Exhibit I RFI No 1, #12 Exhibit J RFI No 1 Response, #13 Exhibit K NOE No 1, #14 Exhibit L NOE No 2, #15 Exhibit M NOE No 1 and No 2 Response, #16 Exhibit N RFI No 2, #17 Exhibit O NOE No 3, #18 Exhibit P NOE No 3 Response, #19 Exhibit Q NOE No 4, #20 Exhibit R Note and Mortgage)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markus et al v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY MARKUS
Represented By: Michael Patrick Maxwell, Jr.
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN MARKUS
Represented By: Michael Patrick Maxwell, Jr.
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANCARE, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?