Oliver v. Carr et al
Plaintiff: King Michael Oliver and Michael Oliver
Defendant: Jason Clark, Judge Grace, Judge Bloodwurth, Michael C. Carr and G. Rowald
Case Number: 3:2019cv00899
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/7/2019. (jaj)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Clerk's Judgment. Document was titled incorrectly as a Memorandum and Order instead of Judgment. Entry stricken and Judgment to be re-filed this date.(jaj)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY STRICKEN - CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/7/2019. (ksp) Modified on 10/8/2019 (jaj).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/7/2019. (ksp)
August 22, 2019 Amended Pleadings - Complaint - due by 9/23/2019. (cjo)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This matter does not survive 28 U.S.C. 1915A review, and the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendants Michael C. Carr, Jason Clark, Judge Grace, and Judge Bloodworth are DISMISSED with prejudice and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TERMINATE them as parties in the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing ("CM/ECF") system. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED and his Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a First Amended Complaint on or before September 23, 2019. Should Plaintiff fail to file his First Amended Complaint within the allotted time or consistent with the instructions set forth in the Order, the entire case shall be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and/or for failure to prosecute his claims. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank civil rights complaint form and to add "also known as Michael Oliver" to Plaintiff's name on the docket in CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/21/2019. (ksp)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-cv-899-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/19/2019. (jsm2)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by King Michael Oliver. (jsm2)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by King Michael Oliver. (jsm2)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by King Michael Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents).(jsm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Carr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Michael Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Bloodwurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Rowald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?