Moyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shane T. Moyer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00970
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Donald G Wilkerson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERRAL: Upon consent of parties case transferred to Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson for final disposition. Judge J. Phil Gilbert no longer assigned to the case. (kek)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Garrison, Suzanne) Unsealed on 9/25/2019 (kek).
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Garrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Garrison, Suzanne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and original mailed to Attorney Severs. (kek)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shane T. Moyer. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/9/2019. (jdh)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Severs, Traci) Unsealed on 9/25/2019 (kek).
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-970-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (kek)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shane T. Moyer. (Severs, Traci)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Traci L. Severs on behalf of Shane T. Moyer (Severs, Traci)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Shane T. Moyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Andrew Saul)(Severs, Traci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Suzanne M. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane T. Moyer
Represented By: Traci L. Severs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?