Painters USA, Inc. v Traveler's Casualty & Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Painters USA, Inc. and USA
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, Direct Steel, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01080
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Rosenstengel
Referring Judge: Gilbert C Sison
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay Agreed by Painters USA, Inc.. (Pierce, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 COMPLAINT First Amended against Direct Steel, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed by Painters USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - McHenry County Amended Complaint)(Pierce, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pierce, Charles)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Direct Steel, LLC. (Novak, Philip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Novak, Philip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Novak on behalf of Direct Steel, LLC (Novak, Philip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip M. Novak on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Novak, Philip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Elizer on behalf of Direct Steel, LLC (Elizer, Steven)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Elizer on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Elizer, Steven)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. The 21-day deadline set forth in this Order does not apply to unserved parties. Deadlines for newly served parties to consent or decline to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge will be set by the Court at a later date. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 12/2/2019. (kek)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 12/2/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT First Amended against Direct Steel, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed by Painters USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Payment Bond, #2 Exhibit McHenry County Amended Complaint)(Pierce, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Painters USA, Inc.. (Pierce, Charles)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Painters USA, Inc.. (Pierce, Charles)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Painters USA, Inc. Incorrect filing event used. Document should be re-filed using the event "Corporate Disclosure Statement" located under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 STRICKEN - DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Painters USA, Inc..(Pierce, Charles) Modified on 11/8/2019 (kek).
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Painters USA, Inc.. Direct Steel, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Pierce, Charles)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Painters USA, Inc.. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Pierce, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Pierce on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pierce, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ACTION - See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Pierce does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1080-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3993728.), filed by Painters USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State court complaint, #3 Exhibit bond info)(Pierce, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters USA, Inc. v Traveler's Casualty & Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Steel, LLC
Represented By: Philip M. Novak
Represented By: Steven H. Elizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Philip M. Novak
Represented By: Steven H. Elizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters USA, Inc.
Represented By: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?