Nelson v. Perry Co. Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Mae Dennis Nelson
Defendant: Perry Co. Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv01091
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mark A Beatty
Referring Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE: A party to this action has declined to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. Accordingly, pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1091-SMY. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (kdw)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, this case has been selected for reassignment to a Magistrate Judge. Within 21 days of this Order, any party not previously having filed a Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form in this case must file the attached form indicating that party's consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent due by 12/11/2019.. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/20/2019. (jaj)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense by Mae Dennis Nelson. (kdw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Recruitment of Counsel by Mae Dennis Nelson. (kdw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mae Dennis Nelson. (kdw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Perry Co. Housing Authority, filed by Mae Dennis Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)(kdw)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1091-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kdw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Perry Co. Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Dennis Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Co. Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?