USA v. One Taurus PT709 9mm Slim Pistol, Bearing Serial Number TJY01510 and any and all Ammunition Contained Therein or Seized Therewith et al
Plaintiff: United States and USA
Defendant: $5,050.00 in United States Currency and One Taurus PT709 9mm Slim Pistol, Bearing Serial Number TJY01510 and any and all Ammunition Contained Therein or Seized Therewith
Case Number: 3:2019cv01095
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: J Phil Gilbert
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed within 14 days of this Order or before the deadline for filing dispositive motions, whichever is later. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is included for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1095-JPG. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/22/2019. (jaj)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, granting #4 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Stay of Civil Forfeiture) filed by USA. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 11/4/2019. (jdh)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay (Motion for Stay of Civil Forfeiture) by USA. (Hanna, Adam)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1095-JPG-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(rah)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam E. Hanna on behalf of United States (Hanna, Adam)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against $5,050.00 in United States Currency, One Taurus PT709 9mm Slim Pistol, Bearing Serial Number TJY01510 and any and all Ammunition Contained Therein or Seized Therewith, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanna, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One Taurus PT709 9mm Slim Pistol, Bearing Serial Number TJY01510 and any and all Ammunition Contained Therein or Seized Therewith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,050.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Taurus PT709 9mm Slim Pistol, Bearing Serial Number TJY01510 and any and all Ammunition Contained Therein or Seized Therewith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Adam E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?