Osborne v. USA
Plaintiff: Paige Osborne
Defendant: Macoupin County Public Health Department d/b/a Maple Street Dental Clinic, Blake Ferando, DMD, Macoupin County Public Health Department and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01122
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Staci M Yandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by USA. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Jones, Laura)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Motion to Substitute the United States of America for Defendants Blake Fernando, DMD, and Macoupin County Health Department d/b/a Maple Street Dental Clinic (Doc. #4 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to change the case caption to Paige Osborne v. the United States of America. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/11/2019. (dah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order 257, effective immediately, this case will no longer be referred to a Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Should the parties elect to consent to have the Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this matter, the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form shall be filed within 14 days of this Order or before the deadline for filing dispositive motions, whichever is later. Consents filed after this deadline may not be accepted by the District Judge. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is included for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to case. All future documents must bear case number 19-1122-SMY. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 11/26/2019. (kdw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Staci M. Yandle and Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-1122-SMY-MAB. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(lmb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Party Motion to Substitute the USA for Defendants Blake Ferando, DMD, and Macoupin County Public Health Department by Blake Ferando, DMD, Macoupin County Public Health Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Meredith Torres)(Jones, Laura)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Jones on behalf of Blake Ferando, DMD (Jones, Laura)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Jones on behalf of Macoupin County Public Health Department (Jones, Laura)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Third Judicial Circuit, Madison County, IL, case number 2019-L-1051, filed by Macoupin County Public Health Department, Blake Ferando, DMD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Scope of Employment, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macoupin County Public Health Department d/b/a Maple Street Dental Clinic
Represented By: Laura J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Ferando, DMD
Represented By: Laura J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macoupin County Public Health Department
Represented By: Laura J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Laura J. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Osborne
Represented By: Daniel C. Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?